Vedic Maths Tricks to Calculate 10x Faster
Vedic Maths Tricks
Smart tricks that your child should learn to speed up math calculations. Is your child struggling with math problems? If so, this article will open Pandora’s box for you because we will share some of the simplest Vedic Maths tricks for solving complex problems.
What is Vedic Mathematics?
Vedic Maths is a present from the past given to us by renowned Indian scholars. It is an ancient form of mathematics that was rediscovered from the Vedas by Shri Bharti Krishna Tirthaji between 1911 and 1918. It includes a plethora of techniques for making math problems more effective and efficient. Long and tedious calculations become simple when using this method.
We can calculate the answer with pinpoint accuracy in less than a minute. This helps with not only arithmetic, but also algebra, geometry, trigonometry, calculus, and applied mathematics. Vedic Math techniques are so simple that even the most difficult questions can be solved mentally.
What Are The Benefits Of Learning Vedic Mathematics?
Using Vedic Math Tricks, you can solve any difficult/timeconsuming JEE problem or ICSE/ CBSE Math problem instantly. Furthermore, the beauty of Vedic Maths is that you can solve a problem mentally just by using it. If you come across polynomial functions and quadratic sums in a higher class in CBSE or ICSE Board, knowing Vedic Maths will help you beat the difficulty level of those sums.
Who Is The Father Of Vedic Maths?
Vedic mathematics simplifies arithmetic operations, and these formulas and concepts are gaining popularity around the world. Shankaracharya Bharti Krishna Tirthaji, known as the ‘Father of Vedic Mathematics,’ discovered the ancient method of solving Mathematics problems.
These Vedic Maths Tricks are extremely beneficial in passing any competitive exam. So here are some of the Vedic Maths tricks we mentioned:
Squaring Of A Number Whose Unit Digit Is 5 (Vedic Maths Tricks)
You can quickly find the square of a twodigit number ending in 5 using this Vedic Math trick. Whatever syllabus you follow, whether CBSE or ICSE, you will undoubtedly encounter such sums.
For example Find (55) ² =?
Step 1. 55 x 55 = . . 25 (end terms)
Step 2. 5x (5+1) = 30
So our answer will be 3025.
Well, if you have understood the process try to find the square of 25 & 85.
Multiplication of a number with 5 (Vedic Maths Tricks)
It’s simple to remember 5 tables. However, as the smaller numbers become larger, the calculation becomes more difficult. This Vedic maths technique will assist you in resolving this issue.
You must divide any number by two in this case. If your answer is a whole number, subtract 0 (zero digits) from the end. If the number is not a whole number, add 5 to the end and disregard the remainder.
For example: 8422 x 5 =?
Step 1: 8422 / 2 = 4211
Step 2: It is a whole number, so add 0
The answer will be 8422 x 5 = 42110
Let’s try another: 7337 x 5 =?
Step 1: 3773 / 2 = 3668.5
Step 2: This is a fractional number, so we will ignore the remainder and add 5 at the end.
The answer will be 7337 x 5 = 36685
Time to check your knowledge:
Now try — 1234 x 5, 123 x 5
Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000 (Vedic Maths Tricks)
Tell me how long it will take you to subtract a number from a multiple of 100, such as 1000, 1000, or 10000. Is there a time limit of one minute or less? Leave that aside and see if you can calculate with this new formula and see if it’s simple and shortens your calculation time!
For example: 1000 – 876 =?
We simply subtract each figure in 876 from 9 and the last figure from 10.
Step 1. 9 – 8 = 1
Step 2. 9 – 7 = 2
Step 3. 10 – 6 = 4
So, the answer is 1000 – 473 = 124
How to Multiply any 2digit numbers between 11 to 19 (Vedic Maths Tricks)
If you’re like us and can’t remember the tables after ten, this trick will come in handy. After enough practice, you will be able to calculate the results quickly. This type of trick has a total of four steps to solve.
 Add the unit digit of a smaller number to the larger number.
 Multiply the sum result by 10.
 Multiply both numbers’ unit digits.
 Add both the numbers (which were involved in steps 1 & step 2).
For example: Take 2 numbers like 12 and 15.
15 + 2 =17
17*10 = 170
2*5 = 10
Add the two numbers, 170+10 and the answer is 180
Dividing A Large Number By 5 (Vedic Maths Tricks)
Tell me how you normally divide a large number by five. And how long does it take you to solve such problems?
Here’s the problem: divide 2128 by 5. Start the timer before you begin.
In 2 seconds, you’ve completed your task? Ok! Is it only 4 seconds?
No? So, the next time you divide a number, use this Vedic Trick and keep track of how long it takes you to solve the sum.
 Multiply the number by 2
 Move the decimal point to the left.
 Left side of the decimal point is your answer.
For example: 245 / 5 =?
Step 1. 245 * 2 = 490
Step 2. Move the decimal: 49.0 or just 49
Let’s try another: 2129 / 5
Step 1: 2129 * 2 = 4258
Step2: Move the decimal: 425.8 or just 425
Now you try to solve 16951/5, 2112/5, 4731/5
Multiply Any Twodigit Number By 11 (Vedic Maths Tricks)
This Vedic Maths trick will allow you to complete multiplication in under 2 seconds. So, let’s see how you can use this Vedic Trick to reduce your calculation time.
For example:
32 x 11
32 * 11 = 3 (3+2) 2 = 352
So, the answer is: 32 * 11 =352
Another Example:
52 x 11 = 5 (5+2) 2 = 572
Now try 35*11, 19*11, 18*11.
Multiplication Of Any 3digit Numbers (Vedic Maths Tricks)
Suppose you want to multiply these 2 numbers: 306 and 308
Step 1. Now subtract the unit place digit from the actual number.
3088=300
3066=300
Step 2. Now select any (1st or 2nd) number and add the unit digit of the other number
308+6=314
Step 3. Now we will multiply the product we got in step 2 and step 1; 314×300 = 94200
Step 4. Unit digits of both the numbers are 8 & 6. The product of these 2 numbers: 8×6=48
Step 5. Last step: 94200 + 48 = 94248
So our final answer 306 x 308 = 306 is 94248
Solve these sums using the same method and feel the difference 808*206, 536*504, 408*416.
Find The Square Value (Vedic Maths Tricks)
Using the Vedic Maths Trick, finding the square of a number is simple. Simply follow the steps below:
 Select a base that is closer to the original value.
 Determine the numbers different from the base.
 Subtract the difference from the original figure.
 Take the result and multiply it by the base.
 Multiply the result of the above point by the product of the square of the difference.
If you look through any competitive exam paper, you’ll notice that numerous Math problems can be solved quickly and easily using these Vedic Math Tricks. You can use these Vedic Math tricks not only for competitive exams like Olympiad, KVPY, and JEE but also in your regular school studies to improve speed and accuracy. Lots of practice is required.
These tricks may appear complex or difficult at first, but with practice, they will perform admirably when you begin your calculation. Leave a comment and tell us whether you found these tips to be useful or not!
Vedic Maths for Kids: A Fun and Easy Way to Learn Math
Mathematics is a fundamental subject that is essential for children to learn. However, many kids find it challenging and struggle to grasp math concepts. Vedic maths is a unique approach to teaching mathematics that has gained popularity in recent years. This article will explore what Vedic maths is, how it works, and why it is a great tool for kids to learn math.
How Does Vedic Maths Work?
Vedic maths consists of 16 sutras or principles that are used to solve mathematical problems. These sutras are simple and easy to remember, making them an effective tool for kids to learn math. Here are some examples of the sutras used in Vedic maths:
 Ekadhikena Purvena: By one more than the previous one
 Nikhilam Navatashcaramam Dasatah: All from 9 and the last from 10
 UrdhvaTiryagbyham: Vertically and crosswise
 Paravartya Yojayet: Transpose and adjust
Vedic maths also uses a set of 16 subsutras or corollaries that further simplify the calculation process. These subsutras are based on patterns and relationships that exist in the numbers. By using these sutras and subsutras, children can quickly perform complex calculations in their head.
Why is Vedic Maths a Great Tool for Kids to Learn Math?
Vedic maths is a great tool for kids to learn math for several reasons. Firstly, it is a fun and engaging way to learn math. Vedic maths uses a variety of visual and spatial techniques that stimulate the brain and make learning enjoyable. Secondly, Vedic maths is an excellent tool for developing mental agility and creativity. The system encourages kids to use their intuition and come up with their unique solutions to problems. Thirdly, Vedic maths is a timesaving technique that can help kids perform calculations quickly and accurately. This skill is useful not only in math but in everyday life as well.
How Can Parents Introduce Vedic Maths to Their Kids?
Parents can introduce Vedic maths to their kids in several ways. Firstly, they can enroll their children in a Vedic maths class. Many online and offline programs teach Vedic maths to children of all ages. These classes are usually interactive and fun, making learning enjoyable for kids. Secondly, parents can purchase Vedic maths books and resources and teach their kids at home. There are many books and resources available online that provide stepbystep guidance on how to use Vedic maths. Finally, parents can incorporate Vedic maths into their everyday life by using it to solve simple calculations like grocery bills, time, and distance.
FAQs

Is Vedic maths suitable for all ages?
Yes, Vedic maths is suitable for children of all ages, as well as adults. The system is designed to be simple and easy to learn, making it accessible to everyone. 
Will learning Vedic maths be too difficult for my child?
Not at all. Vedic maths is designed to be easy to learn and use. The system uses visual and spatial techniques that make learning math fun and engaging for kids. 
Can Vedic maths help my child perform better in school?
Yes, learning Vedic maths can help your child perform better in math and other subjects. The system encourages creativity and mental agility, which can improve problemsolving skills and overall academic performance. 
How long does it take to learn Vedic maths?
The time it takes to learn Vedic maths depends on the individual child’s learning style and pace. Some children may pick up the system quickly, while others may take longer. However, with regular practice and guidance, most children can learn Vedic maths within a few weeks or months. 
Are there any downsides to learning Vedic maths?
There are no significant downsides to learning Vedic maths. However, some children may find the system too different from what they are used to and may take some time to adjust. Additionally, some children may prefer traditional math methods over Vedic maths.
Vedic Maths Tricks Powered By thinkIIT
Comments
Leave a Reply
You must be logged in to post a comment.
Martin victor
Your way of explanation is very beautiful. and your content is very effective and informative.